MD HB111 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable if they prohibit or unreasonably restrict the installation or use of electric vehicle recharging equipment; authorizing the Maryland Energy Administration to issue multiple electric vehicle recharging equipment rebates to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association for the lesser of 40% of the costs of the equipment or $5,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings Finance
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (124-14)
2020-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {770415/4 Adopted
2020-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB734 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property11111.4(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B111.8(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property14129(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92009(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback