MD HB111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person may not be prosecuted for the abandonment or refusal to return a rented motor vehicle if, within 5 days after a written demand for the return of the motor vehicle is mailed by regular mail and certified United States mail, return receipt requested, to the person who leased or rented the motor vehicle, the person returns or accounts for the motor vehicle to the person who delivered the motor vehicle; and providing that a prosecution may not be started until 5 days after the written demand is mailed.
Title
Criminal Law - Failure to Return Rental Vehicle - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 828579/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-20 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-17 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (128-10) | |
2012-03-31 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments 652915/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Judiciary |