MD HB1108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals to maintain an electronic roster of all individuals certified by the Board; requiring that the roster be available for electronic verification of certification through the Board's website; authorizing certain individuals to contact the Board to verify a certificate; and repealing a certain requirement that a certain renewal notice sent by the Board contain certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Certification - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations20307(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations20310(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback