MD HB1106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering references to "light wine" in alcoholic beverages licenses in Washington County to refer instead to "wine"; and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to issue a refillable container permit for wine to certain license holders.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Wine
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |