MD HB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring vehicle manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches, or their agents, to allow vehicle dealers to furnish consumer data in a certain manner; authorizing manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches to access data management systems with express written consent of the dealer; prohibiting manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches from requiring a dealer to grant access to the dealer's data management systems through a franchise agreement; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data Protection
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310719/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Records
Reports
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties
Claims
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Records
Reports
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties