MD HB1101 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission; providing for the purpose and membership of the Commission; providing for the terms of the members of the Commission; establishing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Fund; requiring the Commission to issue a specified request for applications at least annually; requiring a specified application submitted by an academic medical center to include specified information; limiting the number of programs the Commission may approve to operate at one time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission

Sponsors

Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Peter Hammen [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]
Del. Donald Elliott [R]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]
Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Sen. Brian Feldman [D]Del. Shawn Tarrant [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Rudolph Cane [D]Del. Brian McHale [D]Del. James Malone [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Wade Kach [R]Del. Galen Clagett [D]Del. John Cluster [R]Del. James Hubbard [D]
Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. William Frank [R]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Jolene Ivey [D]Del. Mary Love [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Michael Vaughn [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Melvin Stukes [D]Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Sen. Mary Washington [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Barbara Frush [D]Sen. Barbara Robinson [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. John Donoghue [D]
Sen. Craig Zucker [D]Del. Michael Weir [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Sen. Jill Carter [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Heather Mizeur [D]Del. Doyle Niemann [D]Del. Michael Summers [D]
Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Peter Murphy [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D]
Del. Joseph Minnick [D]Del. Sam Arora [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Michael Smigiel [R]Del. Aisha Braveboy [D]Del. Tom Hucker [D]
Sen. Susan Lee [D]

Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-28) (Y: 108 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403
2013-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2013-04-08SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
2013-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (108-28)
2013-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-22HouseSpecial Order until 3/23 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2013-03-22HouseFloor Committee Amendment {846885/1 Adopted
2013-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {616480/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-21HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2013-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2013-03-05HouseHearing cancelled (Judiciary)
2013-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2013-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1101&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb1101f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb1101t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_403_hb1101t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1101_61648001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1101_84688501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb1101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1101_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1101_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1101_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb1101_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1101,h-0723&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1101,s-1213&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback