MD HB1101 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the diseases and cancers that are considered occupational diseases suffered in the line of duty and are compensable in a specified manner; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, with the agreement of specified stakeholders, to contract with a specified individual to study specified types of cancers that specified individuals may contract in the line of duty; providing for the purpose of the study; providing that any funding needed for the study shall be from sources other than the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions and Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-03 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)
2012-04-02 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-04-02 Favorable with Amendments 477270/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-07 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2012-03-28 Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-22 First Reading Finance
2012-04-05 Passed Enrolled
2012-04-05 Third Reading Passed (101-33)
2012-04-05 House Concur - Senate Amendments
2012-03-23 Third Reading Passed (96-34)
2012-03-22 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-22 Floor Committee Amendment 843192/2 Adopted
2012-03-22 Special Order until later today (Delegate Busch) Adopted
2012-03-21 Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
2012-03-21 Favorable with Amendments 233290/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-24 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2012-02-14 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-10 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback