MD HB1101 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a landlord to offer a 36-month residential lease for residential dwelling structures offered for rent to individuals age 55 years and older; limiting the application of the Act to properties that are composed of at least five dwelling units and to properties that have received funding from the State on or after October 1, 2011, that is used for construction of or improvements to the structure; and requiring the 36-month residential lease required under the Act to be offered to specified individuals and lessees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Age 55 and Older - Residential Leases

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-23 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2011-02-16 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback