MD HB1100 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to meet four times per year instead of every 6 weeks; repealing the requirement that the Board hire general counsel; providing that the Attorney General is the legal advisor for the Board; requiring the Attorney General to designate an assistant attorney general as counsel to the Board; authorizing the Attorney General to assign certain attorneys to the Board under certain circumstances; establishing certain duties for the counsel to the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Affordability Board – Meetings, Legal Advisor, Reports, and Technical Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-13SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {376982/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General212C-03(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General212C-07(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General212C-08(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General212C-13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21-2C13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21-2C14(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21-2C15(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback