MD HB11 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB250

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations by December 31, 2026, to identify additional standards for water quality testing; requiring the Department, subject to certain funding and in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to utilize an online portal to receive and upload certain information and to provide public access to the information; requiring the Department of the Environment to consistently share the information collected with the Maryland Department of Health and local health departments; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Well Safety Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587
2023-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (102-37)
2023-04-10HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2023-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (32-11)
2023-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {323427/1 Adopted
2023-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-20SenateReferred Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (100-35)
2023-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {973322/1 Adopted
2023-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-01-27HouseHearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
2023-01-27HouseHearing canceled
2023-01-19HouseHearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2023-01-19HouseHearing canceled
2023-01-19HouseHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-11HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2022-11-18HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB250 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted
SB483 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment94A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property10713(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0011?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0011f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0011t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0011e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_587_hb0011e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0011_97332201.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0011_32342701.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0011_ent.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0011_eee.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0561.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1286.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/1081.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback