MD HB1099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the State Athletic Commission in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission; and requiring that an evaluation of the Commission and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Commission be performed on or before December 15, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback