MD HB1098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, instead of requiring, an appropriation for the Commission for the Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship; establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program to provide grants for the capital equipping of school facilities used to provide a certain career and technology program; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; terminating certain provisions of the Act after June 30, 2026; etc.
Title
Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2018-02-09 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations and Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education
Education, Boards of
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education
Education, Boards of
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment