MD HB1096 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to a forensic laboratory for analysis unless a certain requirement is met; requiring that a victim who wishes to remain anonymous and not file a criminal complaint be informed that the victim may initiate a criminal complaint at a future time; requiring a certain law enforcement agency that receives a sexual assault evidence collection kit and all requested associated reference standards to submit the kit for forensic analysis within 30 days of receipt of the kit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34
2019-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {518777/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {692311/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1096&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1096f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1096t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1096e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_34_hb1096e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1096_69231101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1096_51877701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1096_50372901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1096.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1096_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0479.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1096_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1117.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1354.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback