MD HB1095 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law requiring the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to determine a certain funding source by December 31, 2020; requiring the Board to assess and collect a certain fee from certain persons in a certain manner; requiring the Board to calculate a certain fee in a certain manner; requiring entities assessed a certain fee to pay the fee on or before October 1 each year; establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (98-36)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {476085/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB669 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19132(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General212C-11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations126C-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151601(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback