MD HB1095 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments, under specified circumstances, to provide specified parents or guardians with an oral and written notice that their child may be eligible for publicly funded prekindergarten programs; requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments to report annually to the General Assembly on the number of parents who were given a notification and who subsequently enrolled their child in the specified program; etc.
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {215863/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Guardians
Minors
Notices
Public Information
Public Schools
Social Services
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Guardians
Minors
Notices
Public Information
Public Schools
Social Services