MD HB1095 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency to adopt by January 1, 2014, a written policy and procedure to govern specified disciplinary actions that may be taken against a specified law enforcement officer; requiring each written policy to include specified information; requiring, under specified circumstances, a law enforcement officer to be disciplined in accordance with a specified policy and procedure; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |