MD HB1093 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing parents or specified guardians to apply, on behalf of a minor, for admission of the minor to a certified intensive outpatient alcohol and drug abuse program; requiring specified programs to make a specified note on an application for admission in order for an individual to be retained for specified treatment; providing that specified programs have the right to discharge an individual admitted for specified treatment if the individual is not complying with the policies and procedures of the treatment program or the facility; etc.
Title
Substance Use Treatment - Inpatient and Intensive Outpatient Programs - Consent by Minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {436086/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Substance Abuse