MD HB109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling in the State an expanded polystyrene food service product on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting food service businesses or schools from selling or providing food or beverages in expanded polystyrene food service products on or after July 1, 2020; confirming the authority of local government entities to establish standards that are at least as stringent as those in the Act; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a public education and outreach antilittering campaign; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {903029/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-25) (Y: 18 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {133022/2 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-26) (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-37) (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {843021/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-95) (Y: 39 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713727/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (42-93) (Y: 43 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {333424/2 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (45-88) (Y: 46 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {103020/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-90) (Y: 45 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (100-37)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)
2019-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {903029/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-25)
2019-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {133022/2 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-26)
2019-04-02SenateSpecial Order until evening session (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {274635/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {103020/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-90)
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {333424/2 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (45-88)
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {713727/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (42-93)
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {843021/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-95)
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {223927/1 (Delegate Corderman) Adopted
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order until 03/08 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {120017/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-31HouseHearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0109&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0109f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0109t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0109e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_12001702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_10302001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_22392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_33342402.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_71372701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_72302001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_84302101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_27463501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_13302202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0109_90302901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0109.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0109_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0109_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0348.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0349.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0351.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0371.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0109_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1082.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1083.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1084.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1224.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback