MD HB1089 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain requirements for the appointment and removal of the inspector general of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority by the Board of Directors of the Authority; specifying certain powers and requirements of the inspector general; requiring the Office of the Inspector General to be funded with a grant of at least 0.05% of the annual operating budget of the Authority; requiring that the Office of the Inspector General be operationally and functionally independent of the Authority; etc.
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {497670/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
District of Columbia
Elections
Ethics
Federal Government
Fraud
Governor
Grants
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Mass Transit
Notices
Privacy
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
District of Columbia
Elections
Ethics
Federal Government
Fraud
Governor
Grants
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Mass Transit
Notices
Privacy
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally