MD HB1089 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the salary of each judge of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County and the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County to $33,000 for calendar year 2015 and each subsequent calendar year; providing the Chief Judge shall receive an additional $2,000 annually; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {352511/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation