MD HB1088 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Energy Efficiency On-Bill Financing Program; requiring a utility company to participate in the Program; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration and the Public Service Commission to collaborate for a specified purpose; limiting the cost of an energy efficiency upgrade to a specified amount; requiring the Commission to establish standards for a qualifying energy efficiency upgrade; etc.
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Efficiency On-Bill Financing Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Auditors and Audits
Conservation
Energy Matters
Equipment
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Loans
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Alternative Energy Sources
Auditors and Audits
Conservation
Energy Matters
Equipment
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Loans
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1088.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1088f.pdf |