MD HB1088 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the county boards of education to conduct specified audits at the request of the State Department of Education; requiring local school systems to reimburse the State for specified employer contributions for employees participating in the Teachers' Retirement System or the Teachers' Pension System; providing that the State Department of Education may authorize county boards of education and public libraries to conduct specified audits; etc.
Title
Audit Responsibilities - State Department of Education, Maryland Higher
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/24 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-03-18 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Community Colleges
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Libraries
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Teachers
Auditors and Audits
Community Colleges
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Libraries
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Teachers