MD HB1088 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified insurers to offer in writing, at the time of application and renewal, to provide coverage for loss that is caused by or results from a discharge of water from a specified system or source; requiring the insurers to include a specified statement with the offer; providing that if an application or renewal is made by telephone or the Internet, an insurer is deemed to be in compliance with the Act under specified circumstances; requiring specified insurers to submit specified reports; etc.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Offer of Coverage for Loss Caused by Discharge of Water
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Emmett Burns [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Joseph Minnick [D] | Del. John Olszewski [D] | Del. Michael Weir [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1088.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1088f.pdf |