MD HB1087 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the General Assembly finds that all State residents have a right to health care; providing it is the intent of the General Assembly to establish a comprehensive universal single-payer health care coverage program and a health care cost control system; establishing Healthy Maryland as a public corporation and a unit of State government to provide comprehensive universal health coverage for every State resident; requiring Healthy Maryland to provide certain services for residents of the State by January 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects

Acupuncturists
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Ambulances
Appropriations
Assisted Living
Associations
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Blind Persons
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Caregivers
Certifications
Chiropractors
Civil Actions
Claims
Clinics
Codes
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Corporations
Counselors
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Debt Collection
Demographics
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Elderly Persons
Electrologists
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Environmental Health
Equipment
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Gifts
Grants
Harassment
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hearing Aids
Higher Education
Hospices
Hospitals
Immunization
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Investments
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Laboratories
Language
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Managed Care Organizations
Massage
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Medical Research
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Nursing Homes
Occupational Safety
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Physical Therapists
Physicians
Podiatrists
Pregnancy
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Psychologists
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rescue Squads
Residency
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Signatures
Small Business
Social Security
Social Services
Social Workers
Solicitation
State Documents
State Hospitals
Strikes
Substance Abuse
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats
Transportation
Treasurers
Unions
Violence
Vocational Rehabilitation
Vulnerable Adults
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback