MD HB1086 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a unit of State government that administers a tax credit authorized after July 1, 2021, to report to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Committee on Ways and Means on measures that the unit has taken to implement the credit; renaming the Tax Credit Evaluation Act to be the Tax Expenditure Evaluation Act; altering the purposes of the Act to include the legislative review of tax exemptions and preferences; etc.
Title
Maryland Tax Credit Evaluation Act – Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {405169/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Exemptions
General Assembly
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Exemptions
General Assembly
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 1 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |