MD HB1083 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Replacing the term "gang" as it pertains to certain prohibitions against participation in a criminal gang with the term "organization"; requiring certain local jurisdictions to use certain divested assets for certain purposes under certain circumstances; requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with the Maryland State's Attorneys' Association, to develop a plan for a formal process for oversight of prosecutions of offenses involving criminal organizations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 422
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {192814/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB745 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law9801(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law9802(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law9803(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law9804(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law9805(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law9807(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services6112(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7303(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property14125.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback