MD HB1082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the University of Maryland Herschel S. Horowitz Center for Health Literacy as the State's Consumer Health Information Hub; requiring State and local agencies to use plain language in public communications about health, safety, and social services benefits; providing that the provisions of the Act are not subject to judicial review and do not create a judicial or administrative right of action; and establishing grant requirements related to health literacy.
Title
Public Health - Consumer Health Information - Hub and Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-40) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803022/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |