MD HB1082 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain procedures that require a public institution of higher education that denies the transfer of credits to an enrolled student to report the denial to the institution from which the transfer student originates and submit to the Commission a report each year listing the denials and the reasons for the denials; and requiring the procedures to direct the institution from which the transfer student originates to conduct a review of the reasons for the denial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education – Denial of Transfer Credit – Notice and Report (Transfer With Success Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {124867/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education11207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback