MD HB1081 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2016-2017 school year; providing that the purpose of the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification is to recognize local school systems that create, implement, and enforce school start times that are consistent with the school start times recommended by the Department, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, and the American Academy of Pediatrics; etc.
Title
Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-14) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {785460/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health
Licenses
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health
Licenses
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time