MD HB108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB849
Note: Carry Over of previous HB774
Note: Carry Over of previous HB774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-13 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-13 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Universal Basic Income for Transition-Age Youth Program in the Department of Human Services to provide for the economic security of individuals aging out of the out-of-home placement program; providing that payments made under the Program may not be considered income or resources for purposes of determining eligibility for certain benefits; and requiring the Department to report annually on the Program to the General Assembly.
Title
Human Services - Universal Basic Income for Transition-Age Youth - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-13 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2022-11-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Carry Over) 2023-01-13 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB774 (Carry Over) 2022-02-15 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB774 (Carry Over) 2022-02-15 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Foster Care
Human Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Youth
Human Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5-5C | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5-5C | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5-5C | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5-5C | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0108?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0108f.pdf |