MD HB1079 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Montgomery County to create the Montgomery County Student Loan Refinancing Authority through an ordinance enacted by the Montgomery County governing body; establishing that the purpose of the Authority is to provide affordable financial assistance to enable County residents, graduates of county public schools, and other specified individuals to obtain a postsecondary education; requiring Montgomery County to take specified actions before establishing the Authority; etc.
Title
Montgomery County Student Loan Refinancing Authority MC 27-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-7) (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-7) (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-7) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {195962/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Contracts
Education
Education - Local Bills
Exemptions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Loans
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Contracts
Education
Education - Local Bills
Exemptions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Loans
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students