MD HB1078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain person from distributing, purchasing for sale, or selling products containing delta-8- or delta-10-tetrahydrocannabinol to an individual under the age of 21 years; requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, in consultation with the State Department of Agriculture and other stakeholders, to study and make recommendations on the classification and regulation of tetrahydrocannabinols, other than delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol, and certain other manufactured products; etc.
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {133821/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {143526/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB788 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
Subjects
Age
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Cannabis Production
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drivers' Licenses
Drugs
Electronic Commerce
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Health
Identification
internet
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Repeat Offenders
Safety
Weights and Measures
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Cannabis Production
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drivers' Licenses
Drugs
Electronic Commerce
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Health
Identification
internet
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Repeat Offenders
Safety
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |