MD HB1078 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county board of education or public school from spending any money from any source to directly or indirectly provide a teacher with a firearm or train a teacher in the use of a firearm; and providing the Act does not apply to a school-approved sport or club that makes use of firearms.
Title
Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding (No Funding for Firearms Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-40) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Guns
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Teachers
Education
Education, Boards of
Guns
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Teachers