MD HB1078 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a county board of education or public school from spending any money from any source to directly or indirectly provide a teacher with a firearm or train a teacher in the use of a firearm; and providing the Act does not apply to a school-approved sport or club that makes use of firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding (No Funding for Firearms Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (91-40)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7125(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback