MD HB1078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law designating Presidents' Day and the Monday after Easter as public school holidays; and requiring public schools to devote part of the day to appropriate exercises for the observance of Presidents' Day.
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Presidents' Day and Easter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-19) (Y: 121 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-19) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |