MD HB1078 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an insurer is not prohibited from paying certain commissions to licensed insurance producers under commercial insurance policies issued to certain exempt commercial policyholders in a certain manner under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all policies of commercial insurance offered, sold, or issued in the State on or after October 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Commercial Insurance - Insurance Producers - Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893298/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |