MD HB1077 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain fees and surcharges on the recordation of instruments among the land records do not apply to the recordation of a certain restrictive covenant modification or an amendment to the common area deeds or other declarations of a homeowners association that deletes a covenant or restriction that restricts ownership based on race, religious belief, or national origin in accordance with certain provisions of law; repealing a deadline of September 30, 2019 for the governing body to delete certain restrictions; etc.
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator West) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {750413/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1056 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Deeds
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Religion
Deeds
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Religion
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 13 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 113.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |