MD HB1074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the categories of individuals who are authorized to be employed or contracted to provide education services for a 10-month or 2-month period with a salary commensurate with the period of employment; extending the date for a certain workgroup to convene and analyze the results of the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to January 1, 2020; charging the workgroup with identifying reforms highlighted by the pilot program and academic research on best practices on education in institutional settings; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-25) (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (112-25)
2019-03-18HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {665863/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback