MD HB1074 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring public institutions of higher education to grant priority registration for courses to certain currently serving members and veterans of the armed forces of the United States; providing that a certain course registration priority applies only within 15 years after an eligible service member was on active duty; providing that a certain course registration priority does not apply to an eligible service member after 4 academic years; requiring public institutions of higher education to adopt certain policies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Institutions of Higher Education - Priority Registration for Members of the Armed Forces

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {284862/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback