MD HB1073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Passive House Pilot Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to assist a nonprofit organization in partnership with neighboring high schools and institutes of higher education to provide students with career and technical educational experiences through the renovation of residential properties to become passive houses; requiring the Department to solicit proposals from nonprofit organizations that feature certain elements; requiring the Department to give priority to certain proposals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-10SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (129-5)
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-07HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-07HouseHearing canceled
2021-02-07HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB636 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6801(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6802(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6803(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6804(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6805(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback