MD HB1073 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a landlord that requires a tenant to make payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord to use a written lease that includes a notice that the tenant is responsible for making payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord and to provide a copy of a certain water or sewer bill to a tenant; and providing for the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {988575/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-2)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {120819/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1073&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1073f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1073t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1073e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1073_12081901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1073_98857501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1073.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1073_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0469.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1073_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1096.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1141.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/veto_letters/hb1073.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback