MD HB1072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to accept a certain form of security from a transportation network company in place of a certain insurance policy if the other form of security adequately provides certain benefits and if the transportation network company is an affiliate of a company that provides taxicab services and has no fewer than 26 nor more than 300 operators; requiring transportation network companies to provide evidence of certain security to the Public Service Commission under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Companies - Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {167178/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1072&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1072f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1072t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1072e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_226_hb1072e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1072_16717802.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1072.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1072_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0296.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1072_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0965.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1164.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback