MD HB1072 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county board of education or a nonpublic school that receives State funds to require each employee to receive annual training on the prevention, identification, and reporting of child sexual abuse; authorizing the instruction and training to include information to help employees recognize and respond to incidents of sexual misconduct; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the State Council on Child Abuse to develop best practices to reduce opportunities for child sexual abuse; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Instruction and Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {375369/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback