MD HB1071 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to distribute the victim's representation notification form developed by the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to each law enforcement agency in the State; requiring a specified investigating agency to provide specified information and a specified form to a victim's representative; altering the time period during which a victim's representative may file a specified form to at least 30 days prior to a specified hearing; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {818474/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {312213/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Electronic Government
Forms
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Police Training Commission
Records
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Victims
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Electronic Government
Forms
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Police Training Commission
Records
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Victims