MD HB107 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB313
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of certain cooperative housing corporations, condominiums, or homeowners associations to have a reserve study conducted of the common elements of the cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association and to update the study every 5 years; imposing certain requirements relating to the annual budget of a cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association; etc.
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsors
Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-39) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623024/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-34) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593025/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-06 | House | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-09-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB313 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Budgets
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Prices
Prince George's County
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Weights and Measures
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Prices
Prince George's County
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 5 | 6B-26.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11 | 109.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11 | 109.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 106.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 112.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 112.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |