MD HB1068 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB862
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local board of elections to count an absentee ballot and reject a provisional ballot if the local board receives a legally sufficient absentee ballot and a provisional ballot from the same individual.
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballot Canvassing – Multiple Ballots Cast by an Individual
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-35) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1068 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 11 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |