MD HB1067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Group; requiring the Advisory Group to study certain programs, review certain studies and reports, invite certain stakeholders to meetings, and make certain recommendations; requiring the Advisory Group to submit a final report to the Maryland Department of Health and certain committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB914 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General134101(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback