MD HB1066 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified employers from including a specified nondisclosure agreement in specified documents, requiring an employee to enter into a nondisclosure agreement, or establishing an expectation with an employee that a specified relationship exists with respect to specified information.
Title
Labor and Employment - Nondisclosure Agreements - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |