MD HB1064 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a vehicle manufacturer to make certain requests of a person seeking to transfer a vehicle dealer franchise or any right under a vehicle dealer franchise within 20 days after receiving notice of the proposed transfer; requiring a vehicle manufacturer to consent to a transfer or provide a written statement with specific grounds for refusing consent within 75 days after receiving all completed forms and requested information from the transferor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (97-35)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {853996/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB813 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation15211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback