MD HB1062 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Class M-G beer, wine, and liquor license for use at a municipal golf course in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue the license to a manager of a municipal golf course; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption on certain land and facilities used for golfing purposes; authorizing the license holder to designate an agent for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {383097/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages201009.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages20102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback